UK PARURESIS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports men and women who suffer from the specific social anxiety Avoidant Paruresis, aka Shy Bladder Syndrome. To this end it provides a website of information, and a moderated online forum. It runs therapeutic residential workshops using a CBT approach, raises public awareness, promotes research, and promotes the concept of individual privacy in public toilet design.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 May 2005: Standard registration
- UKPT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW ALEXANDER WILLIAM SMITH MA CANTAB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ian Michael Harris | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ann Allcoat | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Daw | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY WINTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/03/2020 | 04/03/2021 | 04/03/2022 | 04/03/2023 | 04/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.47k | £5.42k | £20.48k | £15.47k | £42.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.51k | £8.42k | £7.73k | £20.26k | £25.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 March 2021 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 16 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE PHOBIA AVOIDANT PARURESIS BY: A) THE PROVISION OF INTERNET BASED INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. B) THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF LOCAL SUPPORT GROUPS. C) THE PROVISION OF PHOBIA DESENSITISATION WORKSHOPS. D) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONCEPT OF INDIVIDUAL PRIVACY IN THE DESIGN OF PUBLIC TOILETS. E) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CONDITION, PARTICULARLY ITS CAUSE AND TREATMENT. F) THE RAISING OF PUBLIC AWARENESS, INCLUDING THAT OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION. 2) ANY OTHER PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONDITION PARURESIS AT THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UK PARURESIS TRUST
PO BOX 182
KENDAL
LA9 9AE
- Phone:
- 01539735234
- Email:
- admin@ukpt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window