Financial history FRIENDS OF HAMPRESTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108765
Charity reporting is overdue by 722 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £9.87k £9.48k £7.88k £4.27k £4.43k
Total expenditure £14.61k £10.39k £2.64k £2.02k £4.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A