Financial history THE MAUN HOMEOPATHY PROJECT

Charity Number: 1109958
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £46.93k £30.47k £23.83k £21.52k £14.67k
Total expenditure £44.33k £35.30k £24.31k £20.32k £13.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0