Financial history CAMBRIDGE CHINESE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1111280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £57.36k £18.92k £9.37k £65.74k £150.21k
Total expenditure £69.02k £10.42k £9.82k £33.50k £69.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A