Financial history EARLY YEARS NETWORK TOWER HAMLETS

Charity number: 1110092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £415.32k £343.44k £367.03k £328.43k £404.69k
Total expenditure £366.41k £409.40k £337.00k £361.85k £376.09k
Income from government contracts £30.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £129.09k £86.03k £73.87k £111.42k