Governing document EARLY YEARS NETWORK TOWER HAMLETS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND THE FAMILIES OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.