FRIENDS OF YESHIVAS TORAH OHR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the advancement of Orthodox Jewish religious education throughout the world and in particular by supporting the charitable activities of the college (Yeshivas Torah Ohr, Rechov Sorotzkin, Mattersdorf).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 01 April 2005: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Sanger | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Jack Jacob Emanuel | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
PHILIP DAVID WEINSTEIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.44k | £485.03k | £205.80k | £568.91k | £268.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £393.77k | £485.97k | £203.16k | £458.53k | £379.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £568.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £458.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £457.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE COLLEGE (YESHIVAS TORAH OHR, RECHOV SOROTZKIN, MATTERSDORF). THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING PAYMENTS BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN (WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST) TO INDIVIDUAL PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PROVIDED THAT SUCH PERSONS QUALIFY AS OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE COLLEGE AS DETERMINED BY ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 THE RIDGEWAY
LONDON
NW11 8QP
- Phone:
- 02082091113
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window