Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST LABRE INDIAN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1109281
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 04 August 2008 96 days late
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 02 August 2007 94 days late