CHILDREN'S HAPPY HOSPITAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developed good relationships with organisations who have made considerable donations. Supported funding for medical equipment, improved facilities, toys and games, training and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 06 July 2005: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF HAPPY HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS CHRIS FRANKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anita Dykes | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Macdonald | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL LOUISE DEAKIN | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lomas | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RODGERS SUSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE GRACE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.24k | £9.06k | £3.59k | £523 | £745 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.14k | £14.58k | £7.12k | £2.12k | £18.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 2005 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (AND THEIR FAMILIES) WHO ARE PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF THE CHILD HEALTH DIRECTORATE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, TRAINING AND SUPPORT WHICH MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF SUCH PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. DERRIFORD HOSPITAL CATCHMENT AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Children's Happy Hospital,
Child Health Directorate, Level 12
Derriford Hospital
Derriford Road
Plymouth
PL6 8DH
- Phone:
- 07794 751650
- Email:
- chhf@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window