THE LINDSAY LEG CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission: Healthy Legs for Life Main Objective: The facilitating and managing the co-ordinated growth of Leg Clubs throughout England, Wales and Scotland. Systematic demographic, clinical and financial audit is a key feature of Leg Club pactice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Australia
- Finland
- Germany
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hoskins | Chair | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Schofield | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Stephen Clews | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kerr | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ralph Richard Goodman | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Tickner | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemell Geraghty | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MCINTRE | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MCINTYRE | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELLIE LINDSAY OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.07k | £113.51k | £95.92k | £120.28k | £107.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.75k | £63.15k | £68.55k | £90.01k | £104.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/08/2011 as amended on 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
PROTECTING AND PRESERVING HEALTH AMONGST THOSE EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING LEG ULCERS AND/OR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DISSEMINATING AND FACILITATING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE LINDSAY LEG CLUB MODEL; (2) ADVISING ON AND PROMOTING THE PROVISION AND USE OF MODERN EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES AIMED AT DIAGNOSING, PREVENTING AND TREATING LEG ULCERS AND/OR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS; AND (3) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN AND INCREASING THE UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF LEG ULCERS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND HOW THEY CAN BE DIAGNOSED, PREVENTED AND TREATED.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX NO 689
IPSWICH
SUFFOLK
IP1 9BN
- Phone:
- 01473 749565
- Email:
- info@legclub.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window