Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CAMPTON LOWER SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 August 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required