THE NICK WEBBER MEMORIAL TRUST FOR MALAWI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Continued support of Malawian children's charity Tikondane Continued support of NdiMoyo clinic through Nick's Place Continued payment of secondary school fees Usisya Completed construction of refuge for Women Lawyers' Association Distribution of menstrual health kits, Tikondane, Tidzuke Orphan Care and NdiMoyo clinic, Kochilira CDDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Malawi
Governance
- 19 July 2005: Standard registration
- THE NICK WEBBER TRUST (Working name)
- THE NICK WEBBER MEMORIAL TRUST FOW MALAWI (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE WEBBER | Chair | 24 December 2004 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ingle | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR Judith Scott | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY JOY MARVEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JAMES WEBBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE FRANCES ABOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.78k | £42.75k | £47.59k | £25.05k | £35.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.87k | £16.95k | £34.13k | £57.13k | £21.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 24TH NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30TH MAY 2005. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, AMONG PERSONS LIVING IN MALAWI BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN OBTAINING GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES, OR AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 APPLE TREE WALK
CLIMPING
LITTLEHAMPTON
BN17 5QN
- Phone:
- 01903722230
- Email:
- info@nickwebbertrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window