SAN PEDRO FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1108656
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian Faith in Paraguay,South America and in such other parts of the world as the trustees of the charity think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £1,206
Total expenditure: £27,645

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Paraguay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 2005: Standard registration
  • 23 July 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £12.08k £20.08k £16.22k £20.87k £1.21k
Total expenditure £23.66k £14.28k £13.06k £19.66k £27.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 February 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required