FRIENDS OF NEWMAN SCHOOL, ROTHERHAM

Charity number: 1109202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Social Functions/Fashion Show/Ball.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £108,253
Total expenditure: £10,730

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Rotherham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Kulmer Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
Toni Smith Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
CATHERINE BRIDGE Trustee
ROTHERHAM PARENTS FORUM LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.95k £4.60k £6.12k £6.83k £108.25k
Total expenditure £9.64k £9.64k £2.32k £562 £10.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 April 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Newman Special School
East Bawtry Road
Whiston
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 3LX
Phone:
01709828262
Website:

No information available