Financial history MELBOURNE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1108835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £4.39k £2.41k £3.78k £2.18k £4.76k
Total expenditure £4.14k £3.79k £1.73k £2.57k £6.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A