HOME-START UK

Charity number: 1108837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Home-Start offers informal and friendly support to families with young children, providing a lifeline to thousands of parents and children in around 300 communities across the UK, and with forces families in Germany and Cyprus. Support is free, confidential and non-judgemental, and the quality of this is maintained with local schemes working to national standards.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2005: Standard registration
  • 12 December 2016: Funds received from 1119984 HOME-START EAST STAFFORDSHIRE
  • 26 August 2022: Funds received from 1127266 NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH (LEIGHTON BUZZARD)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HOME-START (Working name)
  • HOME-START CONSULTANCY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lin Hinnigan Chair 14 September 2021
None on record
Christine Chapman Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Faiza Waheed Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Tara Spence Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Sarah Duxbury Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Euan Wilmshurst Trustee 20 March 2024
SCHOOLS AND TEACHERS INNOVATING FOR RESULTS
Received: On time
Gyongyi Siffel Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Raymond Ayivor Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Sheena Bolland Trustee 26 June 2019
HOME-START MEDWAY LIMITED
Received: On time
HOLDING ON LETTING GO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.48m £7.00m £4.95m £3.84m £3.85m
Total expenditure £2.72m £5.22m £4.92m £5.92m £3.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £234.82k £1.30m £626.58k £244.67k £292.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £217.75k £1.85m £1.13m £831.92k £1.60m
Income - Other trading activities £21.06k £122.13k £79.95k £45.79k £49.41k
Income - Charitable activities £2.22m £5.01m £3.72m £2.92m £2.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.63k £23.41k £25.23k £39.20k £47.48k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £1.50k £7.35k £2.16k £166.45k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.41m £4.90m £4.59m £5.43m £3.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £305.40k £320.89k £333.58k £485.24k £572.95k
Expenditure - Governance £121.47k £140.34k £153.71k £109.90k £20.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £475.85k £2.95m £1.73m £820.89k £627.64k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £18.43k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £32.65k £20.78k £8.31k £43.54k £63.90k
Long-term investments £347.20k £618.45k £670.76k £646.41k £704.92k
Other assets £2.10m £4.08m £3.86m £1.75m £1.78m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£231.78k -£192.27k -£27.22k -£13.11k £0
Total liabilities £263.84k £701.23k £510.63k £559.62k £478.27k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Clarence House
46 Humberstone Gate
LEICESTER
LE1 3PJ
Phone:
01164645490