VIEW CRAFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a craft group for blind and partially sighted people living in Eastbourne and the Wealden area of East Sussex. A choice of at least five crafts are taught by self-employed professional tutors and free transport is provided by a team of volunteers who also help with the craft activities where needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 01 July 2005: Standard registration
- VIEWCRAFT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TINA WRAY | Chair | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MAY HATHAWAY | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH KING | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARGARET WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | £15.20k | £6.88k | £9.07k | £9.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01k | £5.06k | £13.33k | £17.55k | £15.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 2005 AND 12 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND TO PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE LIVING IN THE WEALDEN AND EASTBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ART AND CRAFT ACTIVITIES WITHIN A SAFE GROUP ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
WEALDEN AND EASTBOURNE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ennerdale
St. Johns Close
CROWBOROUGH
East Sussex
TN6 1RS
- Phone:
- 01892661212
- Email:
- tinawray@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
viewcraft.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window