Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window