Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma-Jane Farrell Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Marie Le Marechal Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Helene Fernandes Trustee 27 November 2023
None on record
Stephania Deidda Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Emma Joan Douglas Boland Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Jane Burke Trustee 05 October 2017
None on record