WHAT ABOUT THE CHILDREN?

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides information from research to parents, professionals and policy makers on brain development in the first 30 to 36 months of life. It works to ensure that all children under three receive consistent, responsive, loving care and for services that promote and support the infant/adult bond to ensure a secure primary attachment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 April 2005: Standard registration
- WHAT ABOUT THE CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Joint | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Linda Margeay Wood | Trustee | 04 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr CAROLE ULANOWSKY | Trustee | 10 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
lydia keyte | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
||||||||
JANE CHRISTINE REDDISH | Trustee | 12 March 2003 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS CATH ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £4.13k | £4.51k | £2.13k | £1.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.07k | £1.59k | £2.97k | £1.77k | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2022 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 18 MAY 2020 as amended on 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
A) To promote prevention of emotional harm of all young children under the age of three, by increasing the knowledge and understanding of infant brain development and the importance of secure infant/parent attachment for future physical and mental health. B) To advance the education of professionals, policy-makers, parents and the public about infant brain development through the organisation of conferences, seminars and the website with information from recent research on topics connected with the brain development from conception to age three, the period of most rapid brain development. C) To assist in the promotion of research into all aspects of such matters and to disseminate the results of such research for the benefit of the public.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Feldon House
Newbold on Stour
WARKS
CV37 8TY
- Phone:
- 08456027145
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window