SANKARA EYE FOUNDATION EUROPE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief for patients suffering from eye relaed illnessess, disease or disability To provide relief to patients for Sankara Eye Care Institutions in India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayesh Govindbhai Patel | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daksha Patel | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ganesan Iyer | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHILPAN MANAHARLAL PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MYTHREYI IYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £4.44k | £3.38k | £10.72k | £968 | |
|
Total expenditure | £218 | £42.66k | £1.56k | £876 | £10.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF PATIENTS OF: - THE SANKARA EYE HOSPITAL IN COIMBATORE, INDIA - THE SANKARA EYE HOSPITAL IN GUNTUT, INDIA - THE SANKARA RURAL EYE HOSPITAL IN KRISHNANKOVIL, INDIA - ANY OTHER NON-PROFIT MAKING/CHARITABLE OPHTHALMOLOGY HOSPITAL OR HOSPITAL DEPARTMENT WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A SCREENING AND DETECTION PROGRAMME, ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. B. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM EYE RELATED ILLNESSES, DISEASE OR DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Penshurst Gardens
EDGWARE
HA8 9TN
- Phone:
- 02089053923
- Email:
- jayeshpateljgp@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window