CHRISTIAN CITY CHURCH - CHELTENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Faith principally achieved through the running of a church in Cheltenham, Glos
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 April 2005: Standard registration
- NEW LIFE CHURCH (Working name)
- NEW LIFE CHURCH (CHELTENHAM) (Previous name)
- THE NEW LIFE CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH WILLIAM ALLAN | Chair | 03 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jackson | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Rees | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Gordon Oliver | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angie Walsh | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christian John James Walsh | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW GORDON BROWN | Trustee | 26 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL HENRY TUCKER | Trustee | 18 July 2007 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN PARR | Trustee | 03 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.01k | £221.89k | £245.72k | £341.63k | £361.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.04k | £217.05k | £245.62k | £297.97k | £356.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 2005 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN CHELTENHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN CHELTENHAM AFORESAID AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM, UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Hatherley Lane
Cheltenham
GL51 6PN
- Phone:
- 01242241461
- Email:
- admin@ccccheltenham.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window