Trustees CHRISTIAN CITY CHURCH - CHELTENHAM
Charity number: 1108838

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH WILLIAM ALLAN | Chair | 03 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jackson | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Rees | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Gordon Oliver | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angie Walsh | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christian John James Walsh | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW GORDON BROWN | Trustee | 26 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL HENRY TUCKER | Trustee | 18 July 2007 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN PARR | Trustee | 03 March 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.