Financial history MEETINGS INDUSTRY MEETING NEEDS

Charity number: 1110830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £131.22k £64.48k £91.56k £120.12k £156.03k
Total expenditure £121.29k £71.69k £95.13k £135.14k £126.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A