Trustees MEETINGS INDUSTRY MEETING NEEDS
Charity Number: 1110830

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Parnham | Chair | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christakis Xenophontos | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Vicki Cowlishaw | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Tawadrous | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Windsor | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Gemma Bassett | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Lernoux-Dock | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Dodgeon | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Kirsch | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lene Corgan | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Conway | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.