ARTHRITIS AND MUSCULOSKELETAL ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Arthritis and Musculoskeletal Alliance (ARMA) is an umbrella body representing the breadth of musculoskeletal conditions and professions. We focus on policy, delivery and practice. Our vision for musculoskeletal (MSK) health: the MSK health of the population is promoted throughout life; everyone with MSK conditions receives appropriate, high quality interventions to promote their health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 April 2005: Standard registration
- ARMA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noha Mohamed Abdel Halim El Afify | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dale Reginald Anthony Webb | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Debbie Lynda Wilson | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ruth Sephton | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Pembery | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Taylor | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Martey | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Huzefa Zakyuddin Vora | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA SARAH LESLEY NORTH | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN ANDREW SKINNER | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.74k | £92.51k | £107.43k | £133.80k | £123.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.74k | £88.33k | £95.50k | £93.19k | £103.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £9.72k | £3.25k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.32k | £5.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN THE CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF RHEUMATIC COMPLAINTS BY BRINGING TOGETHER ORGANISATIONS REPRESENTING PROFESSIONAL AND PATIENT GROUPS WHICH PROMOTES DEVELOPMENT OF AWARENESS, KNOWLEDGE AND THE MEANS OF PREVENTION, TREATMENT, REHABILITATION AND RELIEF OF RHEUMATIC COMPLAINTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
109-111 Fulham Palace Road
LONDON
W6 8JA
- Phone:
- 02038561978
- Email:
- projects@arma.uk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window