Lotus Families

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start East Sussex (new name Lotus from 1 April 2024) is a small, independent East Sussex based charity with a specialism in whole family domestic abuse support. Although we primarily work with women, our aim is to work with the whole family to prevent domestic abuse and wider safeguarding issues, and aid victim-survivors on their journey to recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £151,725 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 05 April 2005: Standard registration
- 26 May 2016: Funds received from 1107920 HOME-START HASTINGS & ROTHER
- HOME START EAST SUSSEX (Previous name)
- HOME-START EAST SUSSEX (Previous name)
- HOME-START SOUTH DOWNS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Rice-Oxley Ms | Chair | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gail Gray | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Becky Louise Reid | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bacchoo | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Tricia Titherly | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MS CHRISTINE MOON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.64k | £145.10k | £176.17k | £292.04k | £325.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.19k | £125.15k | £161.31k | £275.89k | £281.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.60k | £54.07k | £103.80k | £151.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2014 as amended on 01 Apr 2024 as amended on 11 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN EAST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: A) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF WOMEN, CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE AT RISK OF HARM AND DISADVANTAGE, INCLUDING THOSE AT RISK OF DOMESTIC ABUSE IN ALL ITS FORMS. B) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF EASTBOURNE; LEWES AND WEALDEN DISTRICT AND THEIR ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWHAVEN ENTERPRISE CENTRE
DENTON ISLAND
NEWHAVEN
EAST SUSSEX
BN9 9BA
- Phone:
- 01273612025
- Email:
- info@hses.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window