DUDLEY ADVOCACY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support vulnerable people in Dudley to be able make choices and decisions which affect their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michaela Garbett | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Naylor | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Williams | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JADWIGA SHIELS | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES TURLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN DREW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.14k | £343.14k | £341.92k | £44.13k | £543 | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.95k | £223.01k | £331.17k | £118.31k | £77.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £250.00k | £308.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £180.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 JUNE 2005 AND 26 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR LEARNING DIFFICULTY, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, MENTAL ILLNESS OR WHO ARE AGED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVOCACY SERVICE WHICH WILL DIRECTLY RELIEVE THE NEED OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WEST MIDLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Savoy Centre
Northfield Rd
Netherton
Dudley
WEST MIDLANDS
- Phone:
- 01384456877
- Email:
- info@dudleyadvocacy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window