THE CHESHIRE ACADEMY EARLY YEARS DEVELOPMENT CENTRE (L.E.A.P.)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LEAP aims to support children with challenging behaviour to be included socialy and educationally. Included in this work is support for children in their transition to their nursery or school setting. LEAP supports families, by equipping parents with skills to manage their child's behaviour so they may confidently bring positive change to their family life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 08 July 2005: Standard registration
- 13 May 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1084146 HOPES AND BEAMS
- LEAP (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 08 January 2020 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 11 July 2018 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN BETWEEN 18 MONTHS AND 8 YEARS OF AGE WITHIN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND, WHO HAVE BEEN IDENTIFIED AS SUFFERING FROM BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES/DISORDERS OR WHO LACK THE APPROPRIATE SOCIAL, INTELLECTUAL OR EDUCATIONAL SKILLS TO SUSTAIN A PLACE IN MAINSTREAM OR SPECIAL SCHOOL, NURSERY OR PLAYGROUP SETTINGS, BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALISED SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO THEM, THEIR PRIMARY CARERS, SIBLINGS AND THE MAINSTREAM OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS INTO WHICH THEY WILL SUBSEQUENTLY BE REINTEGRATED
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window