THE FRANCIS BERNARD CAUNT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance by means of grant loan or scholarship in such manner and to such individual young persons aged between 16 and 25 years who are (whose parents or guardians are) resident within a 12 mile radius of Newark Parish Church to pursue further or higher education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE KATHRYN RYAN | Chair | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Brian Rollitt | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Brown | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA PARLBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE ROSSIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS NEWSUM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.57k | £48.01k | £43.30k | £46.07k | £55.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.51k | £53.91k | £44.72k | £53.68k | £65.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY MEANS OF GRANT LOAN OR SCHOLARSHIP IN SUCH MANNER AND TO SUCH INDIVIDUAL YOUNG PERSONS AGED BETWEEN 16 AND 25 YEARS WHO ARE (OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE) RESIDENT WITHIN A 12 MILE RADIUS OF NEWARK ON TRENT PARISH CHURCH TO PURSUE FURTHER OR HIGHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
WITHIN A 12 MILE RADIUS OF NEWARK ON TRENT PARISH CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 LOMBARD STREET
NEWARK
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG24 1XE
- Phone:
- 01636703333
- Email:
- info@larken.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window