HOME-START MERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Merton is a voluntary organistion providing support, friendship and practical help to families experiencing stress and difficulties. Referral criteria: Families must have at least one child under the age of 5. Families are visited regularly in their own homes by our trained volunteers who all have experience of parenting and know how hard it can sometimes be.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Merton
Governance
- 08 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yang Li | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Courtney | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Faye Brann | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian Ridley | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Vikrant Bhuskute | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Manuel Boger | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Flacks | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Holmes | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lawrence | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.65k | £127.28k | £72.33k | £77.49k | £124.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.72k | £147.61k | £156.52k | £182.70k | £192.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS; 3.1.2 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 3.1.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 3.1.4 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE WITHIN THE AREA OF MERTON AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
MERTON AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Resource Centre
44 All Saints Road
LONDON
SW19 1BX
- Phone:
- 02086466044
- Email:
- admin@homestartmerton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window