SURVIVORS OF DEPRESSION IN TRANSITION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to give ongoing support and care. They gain self esteem, confidence, mutual peer support, giving the women a chance of moving on from what may have been a very dislocated life. We also help to give then skills and training in how to overcome their illness working in partnership with other agencies. We provide support groups,drop in centre, newsletter,computer skills,conference., advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE JOANNE DE-LA-HAYE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jill Wood | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS BERNADETTE LEAH HANNON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.53k | £33.61k | £52.52k | £66.79k | £62.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.77k | £33.39k | £48.67k | £66.50k | £78.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
- THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG WOMEN RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN SHEFFIELD. - TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF WOMEN SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A0 RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION. - TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF WOMEN SUFFERERS OF DEPRESSION AND RELATED ILLNESS IN SHEFFIELD THROUGH SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DEPRESSION AND RELATED ILLNESS
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 8
SYAC Business Centre
110-120 Wicker
Sheffield
South Yorkshire
S3 8JD
- Phone:
- 01142795970
- Email:
- info@sodit.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window