Accounts and annual returns TSUNAMI THAILAND AID DONATIONS

Charity number: 1108876
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 14 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 14 April 2009 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 14 April 2009 531 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 14 April 2009 531 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 26 January 2007 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 26 January 2007 87 days late