HECKINGTON AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1108859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of agriculture, horticulture and rural crafts for the benefit of the public by holding an annual show

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £411,837
Total expenditure: £330,576

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Grant Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
TERRY ATKINSON Trustee
THE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
CHARLES PINCHBECK Trustee
HECKINGTON WINDMILL TRUST
Received: On time
HERITAGE TRUST OF LINCOLNSHIRE
Received: On time
FREDERICK WARRINGTON CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MILLS ARCHIVE TRUST
Received: On time
LINCOLN LONGWOOL SHEEP BREEDERS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Jacqueline Anne Wright Trustee
None on record
MARK ALISTAIR SARDESON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £545 £105.53k £236.49k £321.73k £411.84k
Total expenditure £20.32k £96.91k £262.17k £297.63k £330.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 26 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Heckington Show
PO Box 207
BOSTON
Lincolnshire
PE21 1BZ
Phone:
01529 461823