SHAKIRY CHARITY FOR SOCIAL SOLIDARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF POVERTY IN IRAQ & AMONG IRAQI PEOPLE; ASSISTING CHILDREN, WIDOWS, ELDERLY, DISABLED & VULNERABLE THROUGH EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE, COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT; ESTABLISHING CITIZEN ADVICE & CARE CENTRES THROUGHOUT IRAQ; ENABLING SELF-SUFFICIENCY, INDEPENDENCE & EMPOWERMENT; PROVIDING LOANS TO DEVELOP WOMEN-LED COTTAGE INDUSTRIES, MICRO-BUSINESSES, & VOLUNTEERISM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Iraq
Governance
- 31 July 2006: Standard registration
- IRAQI CHARITIES FORUM (Working name)
- IRAQI NGOS (NONE GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATION) FORUM (Working name)
- IRAQI CHARITIES FORUM (Previous name)
- IRAQI NGO FORUM (Previous name)
- IRAQI NGOS FORUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Sahib Shakiry | Chair | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ali Alshakri | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaafar Hussain | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAMIL Abdul-Rasul Mohammad Al-SHARIFI | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zuhair Salih Habib | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.19k | £172.07k | £192.88k | £157.05k | £179.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.87k | £188.58k | £174.89k | £159.45k | £184.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.89k | £2.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 25 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFICIENT USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES IN IRAQ AND THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, GUIDANCE, TRAINING AND TECHNICAL AND PROFESSIONAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE. RELIEF OF POVERTY: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN IRAQ AND AMONG IRAQI COMMUNITIES (IN PARTICULAR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS, THE SICK, DISABLED, ELDERLY AND INTERNALLY FORCED DISPLACED PEOPLE) BY PROVIDING: SPONSORSHIP, FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. · COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING: TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IRAQI COMMUNITIES IN IRAQ AND LONDON IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY · SOCIAL INCLUSION: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES IN IRAQ BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.”
Area of benefit
IRAQ AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 12A
Shaftesbury Centre
85 Barlby Road
LONDON
W10 6BN
- Phone:
- 02084525244
- Email:
- admin@shakiry.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window