FIERCE (FESTIVAL) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We bring audiences together through radical live events that are socially engaged and specifically contextualized in the West Midlands. Operating from the principal that everyone is creative, we also carry out a variety of learning activities with artists. We promote the education in and appreciation of live and performance art by sharing it with audiences in unusual places and spaces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 June 2005: Standard registration
- FIERCE FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Burns | Chair | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hassan Hussain | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY OSBORN | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nolly Aicha Bouameur | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Haines | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamila Johnson-Small | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sindy Campbell | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dyke | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Collinge | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.10k | £159.90k | £332.18k | £916.70k | £240.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.98k | £83.11k | £221.54k | £916.91k | £232.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £136.57k | £152.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £244.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £670.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £916.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.89k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2002, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 31 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE CONTEMPORARY ARTS THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF LIVE, PERFORMANCE, VISUAL, MEDIA, MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS, PRINCIPALLY, THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE ANNUAL STAGING OF A FESTIVAL IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 Argent Centre
Frederick Street
Birmingham
B1 3HS
- Phone:
- 07746974900
- Email:
- contact@wearefierce.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window