THE QUEEN ANNE'S GATE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1108903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports educational, medical and rehabilitative charities and those that work with underprivileged areas of society in particular in the UK and Asia.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £2,003
Total expenditure: £54,475

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Hong Kong
  • India
  • North Korea
  • Pakistan
  • Syria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Timothy Allan Chair 08 March 2005
NATIONAL OPERA STUDIO
Received: On time
FAMILIES FOR CHILDREN TRUST
Charity is insolvent
THE GRANGE FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Deborah Fisher Trustee 22 November 2016
BROADWALL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LESLIE SMITH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE RIVER FARM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SOUTH STREET GREEN ROOM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PROSPERO WORLD
Received: On time
SLOANE ROBINSON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CARNELIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathan Mark Edward Boyer Trustee 08 March 2005
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £11.51k £6.35k £3.31k £3.54k £2.00k
Total expenditure £254.42k £188.45k £169.28k £188.90k £54.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 4 Hill Farm
Kirby Road
Kirby Bedon
NORWICH
NR14 7DU
Phone:
01508480100
Website:

No information available