GONVILLE AND CAIUS COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE FOUNDED IN HONOUR OF THE ANNUNCIATION OF THE BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity number: 1137536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gonville and Caius College is a place of education, religion, learning and research in the University of Cambridge. The College provides, in conjunction with the University of Cambridge, an education for some 800 students that is recognised internationally as being of the highest standard. This education develops students academically and prepares them to play full and effective roles in society

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 2010: Standard registration
  • 07 September 2021: Funds received from 313814 TANCRED'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
  • 05 October 2022: Funds received from 283643 THE MICHAEL MILIFFE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GONVILLE AND CAIUS COLLEGE (Working name)
  • GONVILLE AND CAIUS COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
  • GONVILLE AND CAIUS COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pippa Rogerson Chair 01 October 2018
None on record
Sarah Jill Tebbutt Trustee 17 March 2025
THE PERSE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr William Handley Trustee 24 January 2025
None on record
Dr Rebecca Sugden Trustee 24 January 2025
None on record
Dr Vasileios Kotsidis Trustee 24 January 2025
None on record
Professor David Secher Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Dr KATE MILES Trustee 26 April 2024
None on record
FRANCO BASSO Trustee 26 January 2024
None on record
CALLY HAMMOND REVD DR Trustee 06 October 2023
CAIUS HOUSE
Received: On time
Dr John Latimer Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Professor Axel Zeitler Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
PROFESSOR PETER ROBINSON Trustee 30 January 2021
EDSAC REPLICA PROJECT
Received: On time
Dr Andrew Spencer Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.42m £17.85m £23.20m £20.06m £23.46m
Total expenditure £16.47m £22.54m £26.29m £24.90m £24.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £370.49k £240.59k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.88m £5.04m £5.91m £3.60m £4.22m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £124.00k £552.00k £1.07m £1.54m
Income - Charitable activities £7.19m £7.52m £9.37m £9.65m £10.50m
Income - Endowments £905.66k £1.09m £4.09m £1.19m £1.19m
Income - Investment £5.62m £4.89m £7.32m £5.55m £7.01m
Income - Other £448.05k £259.00k £43.00k £174.00k £191.00k
Income - Legacies £532.97k £2.84m £518.00k £1.62m £2.34m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.93m £15.63m £19.57m £18.80m £17.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.35m £6.70m £6.52m £5.89m £6.49m
Expenditure - Governance £103.73k £107.00k £108.92k £136.49k £149.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.25m £6.01m £5.85m £5.11m £5.68m
Expenditure - Other £194.00k £206.00k £197.00k £211.00k £209.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £136.48m £137.82m £136.65m £145.28m £144.10m
Long-term investments £226.34m £259.83m £264.46m £270.70m £286.76m
Other assets £7.11m £7.02m £7.73m £4.13m £5.53m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£8.67m -£7.00m -£6.96m -£6.54m -£2.25m
Total liabilities £19.34m £20.07m £19.53m £30.35m £31.54m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 20 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 17 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gonville & Caius College
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1TA
Phone:
01223332400