Accounts and annual returns MARIAN COWIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1110368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2024 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 July 2024 632 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 July 2024 997 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1667 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1667 days