Trustees OUNDLE MENCAP HOLIDAYS LTD
Charity number: 1108908
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Banerjee | Chair | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ethan Maltlyn | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Huntington | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Fahrenheim | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Barker | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE SYMONDS | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Taylor | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNA CLISH | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDDIE DOVE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.