Accounts and annual returns POWYS ZERO WASTE LIMITED
Charity number: 1111863
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 08 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 20 May 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 28 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 07 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 07 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 20 July 2007 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window