THE NEW QUEST CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a safe, caring and friendly meeting place for our members, where they can meet friends, old and new. To provide stimulation with entertainment and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 07 April 2005: Standard registration
- THE QUEST CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Edwin Miles | Chair | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Robson Mr | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Bartell | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Smith | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Grogan | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.91k | £0 | £2.39k | £7.35k | £9.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.78k | £0 | £4.16k | £4.89k | £6.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITY RESIDING IN DERWENTSIDE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE INTERESTS FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DERWENTSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Park Avenue
Consett
DH8 6AS
- Phone:
- 01207581808
- Email:
- KATALEAN2001@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window