Accounts and annual returns All For Music - Leicester

Charity number: 1108919
Charity reporting is up to date (325 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2025 325 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 May 2025 325 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 June 2024 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 June 2024 340 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window