Accounts and annual returns TUDOR LODGE NO 9635 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1108836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 01 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required