Financial history KYREME ARTS LTD

Charity number: 1110066
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013
Total gross income £18.78k £40.97k £4.41k £2.46k £6.45k
Total expenditure £26.41k £41.90k £3.78k £2.36k £6.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A