Accounts and annual returns CLAPHAM PARK HOMES LIMITED

Charity number: 1109769
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 01 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 29 September 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 30 September 2014 On Time