OTLEY ROAD AND UNDERCLIFFE COMMUNITY WORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Full day care Nursery, community support, health initiatives, jobs and benefits advice, support based on local need, groups and social activities for children and adults across the age range. Children's activities age 5-13. Adult learning to build capacity and skills for local people. This is supported by our creche provision. An elderly day care provision. Partnerships to maximise effectiveness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £334,184 from 7 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 12 April 2005: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY WORKS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RHYS NORTH | Chair | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Raza Khan | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shahnaz Afrin | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samia Naseer | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nabila Begum | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosemary Anne Fairhurst | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Judy White | Trustee | 05 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Naylor | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £489.28k | £520.98k | £413.45k | £411.18k | £441.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £562.68k | £509.15k | £519.96k | £534.17k | £560.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £269.25k | £228.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £288.05k | £10.00k | N/A | £269.51k | £334.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £459.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £46.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £10.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £5.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £509.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 2004. as amended on 16 Sep 2014 as amended on 17 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RETRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL COHESION BETWEEN MULTI ETHNIC, CULTURAL AND FAITH COMMUNITIES; 3.1.5 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: 3.1.5.1 IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR 3.1.5.2 TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.1.6 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.7 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 3.1.8 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.9 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.1.10 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.1.11 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 3.1.12 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 3.1.13 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND 3.1.14 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE BD3 POSTAL AREA AND ITS LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THE DISTRICT OF BRADFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Communityworks
Undercliffe Lane
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD3 0DW
- Phone:
- 01274200589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window