Accounts and annual returns GAYWOOD COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1108971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 February 2025 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 February 2025 601 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 May 2022 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required