THE RAMSES WISSA WASSEF EXHIBITION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, support & encourage the advancement of weaving, particularly with regard to the philosophy of Ramses Wissa Wassef & to disseminate knowledge & promote understanding of tapestries woven at the Ramses Wissa Wassef Art Centre in Egypt
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 April 2005: Standard registration
- 07 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.77k | £125.28k | £5.15k | £2.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.31k | £128.31k | £4.10k | £1.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 11 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 14 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 11 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 16 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 25 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 12 December 2006 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 21 November 2006 | 21 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 02 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ART OF WEAVING, PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO THE PHILOSOPHY OF RAMSES WISSA WASSEF, AND TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE AND PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF TAPESTRIES WOVEN AT THE RAMSES WISSA WASSEF ART CENTRE IN EGYPT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window