THE CAMBRIDGE CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly sunday worship conducted in Cantonese, Mandarin and English; Sunday school for children. Preaching and sermons, organized evangelistic meetings. Home visits, house groups and fellowship groups; Bible studies and prayer meetings. Discipleship training. Donations to other charitable organisations and causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 September 2005: Standard registration
- CCCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIONG NGIAP CHIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ling Hon Lee | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chung Pak Cheung | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yuci Gou | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zhijun Du | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr WEI-LI KUAN | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tsz Hin Ip | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY FONG-FONG LAU | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIU-PONG ANTHONY LAU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.24k | £312.46k | £55.14k | £89.98k | £117.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.90k | £47.61k | £40.54k | £97.26k | £153.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 4 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS SET OUT IN ARTICLE 4 OF THIS CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 POUND HILL
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0AE
- Phone:
- 01223506191
- Email:
- info@cccc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window